THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:28:28 AM
Bence-Bruckler, Isabelle Andri
CPSO#:
60927
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Oct 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Finnish, French, Hungarian
Education: University of Ottawa, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division Of Haematology
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 739-6021
Fax: (613) 737-8861
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:31 Dec 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ISABELLE ANDRI BENCE-BRUCKLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENCE-BRUCKLER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 1990 |