THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:22:40 AM
Crosby, Jacqueline Adrienne
CPSO#:
60924
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Aug 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Aug 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
17 Bear Street
Tillsonburg ON N4G 1V4
Phone: (519) 842-2101
Fax: (519) 842-9668
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Hospital |
Ingersoll |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE ADRIENNE CROSBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROSBY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Nov 1996 to 30 Apr 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 May 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
CF - Surgical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 1990 |