THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:33:34 AM
Bialik, Sean Joseph
CPSO#:
60905
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Jul 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: S. Bialik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
461 Dundas St
Woodstock ON N4S 1C2
Date Received: 01 Apr 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2019 |