THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 9:39:08 AM
Tang, Alan Chi-Luen
CPSO#:
60901
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Aug 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 10
165 Plymouth Road
Welland ON L3B 3E1
Phone: (905) 788-1711
Fax: (905) 788-2332
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site |
Port Colborne |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:02 Sep 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALAN CHI-LUEN TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 1990 |