THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 2:31:05 AM
Willard, Peter Trevor
CPSO#:
60872
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
165 Plymouth Road
Welland ON L3B 3E1
Phone: (905) 714-0080
Fax: (905) 714-1828
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: P.T. Willard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 18 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:06 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER TREVOR WILLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLARD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1993 |