THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:54:38 AM
Donen, Lauren Arlene
CPSO#:
60869
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Apr 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Aug 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Former patients can send medical record requests to Dr. Donen at [email protected] or leave a voice message at 613-627-5485.
Date Received: 17 Feb 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Apr 2024 |