THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 20:23:53 PM
steen, andrea Rose
CPSO#:
60867
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Dec 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Dec 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Rd
Windsor ON N9C 3Z4
Phone: (519)257-5111
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 1991 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREA ROSE STEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 1990 |