THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:35:17 PM
Sugamori, Mark Eisei
CPSO#:
60816
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
25 Rle Andréa
Dieppe NB E1A 8L2
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mark Sugamori Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Riverview Medical Group
6420 Beatty Line N, Unit 203
Fergus, Ontario
N1M 2W3
Date Received: 02 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1994 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2022 |