THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:26:28 PM
Tandan, Ved Raoul
CPSO#:
60813
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 43919
Fax: (905) 381-7053
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital |
Grimsby |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:05 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VED RAOUL TANDAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANDAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Mar 1995
Resident 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1990 |