THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:30:13 AM
Fialkov, Jeffrey Allan
CPSO#:
60807
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jul 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Ctre
Division of Plastic Surgery
M1 524
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4257
Fax: (416) 480-4224
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:28 Aug 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFFREY ALLAN FIALKOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIALKOV is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1990 |