THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:48:08 AM
Malone, Shawn Christopher
CPSO#:
60753
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jan 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Regional Cancer Ctr
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAWN CHRISTOPHER MALONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALONE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 1991 |