THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:37:04 PM
Welbourne, David Robert
CPSO#:
60751
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 May 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Science Centre
Pathology Department
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6584
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID ROBERT WELBOURNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELBOURNE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Laboratory Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - General Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 May 1991 |