THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:25:51 AM
McDowall, Moira Lynne
CPSO#:
60739
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jul 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-502 Oxford St E
London ON N5Y 3H7
Phone: 519 645 6000
Fax: 519 433 5404
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOIRA LYNNE MCDOWALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDOWALL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1990 |