THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:10:15 AM
Miller, Thomas Allen
CPSO#:
60736
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Dec 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
550 Wellington Rd
Parkwood Institute/ Main Building
PMR/ EMG
B4-174
London ON N6C 0A7
Phone: 5196466100 Ext. 65364
Fax: 5196466174
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THOMAS ALLEN MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Dec 1990 |