THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 5:04:20 AM
Buczek, Malgorzata Jadwiga
CPSO#:
60734
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Aug 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish, Russian
Education: Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 729-9463
Fax: (613) 729-5989
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Buczek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Accuro
Unit 1B
700 Industrial Avenue
Ottawa, Ontario
K1G 0Y9
Tel: (613) 738-1242
Fax: (613) 738-0562
Website: http://www.accuro.ca
Date Received: 11 Jul 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 1991 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MALGORZATA JADWIGA BUCZEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCZEK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 1990 |