THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:06:27 AM
Choe, Seong Dong
CPSO#:
60732
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Aug 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: Kyunghee University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite A
3473 Weston Rd
Weston ON M9M 0G4
Phone: (416) 742-4646
Fax: (416) 742-0138
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 1991 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SEONG DONG CHOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1990 |