THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 15:58:12 PM
Harmantas, Athanasios
CPSO#:
60724
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: McMaster University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Sunnyside Wing West
Suite 230
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6694
Fax: (416) 530-6742
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: A. Harmantas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:05 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ATHANASIOS HARMANTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARMANTAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1990 |