THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:30:58 AM
Arlen, Dianne Josephine
CPSO#:
60722
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Apr 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Mar 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dianne J. Arlen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 13 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:St Josephs Healthcare
Division of Nephrology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton, ON L8N 4A6
Date Received: 11 Apr 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:02 Sep 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Nephrology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Apr 2017 |