THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:12:49 PM
Hodges, Brian David
CPSO#:
60705
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
R Fraser Elliott 1-413
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3079
Fax: (416) 340-3792
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Brian D. Hodges Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2017
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIAN DAVID HODGES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODGES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1990 |