THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:28:39 AM
Mitchell, Marianna Kristina
CPSO#:
60669
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Aug 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dundas Medical Center
Suite 306
220 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON L1N 8M7
Phone: (905) 665-9001
Fax: (905) 665-9335
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIANNA KRISTINA MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1991 |