THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:29:22 PM
Takeuchi, Lawrence
CPSO#:
60649
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 May 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: L. Takeuchi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2009
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 May 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Aug 2014 |