THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:17:28 PM
Provost, Ninon Marguerite Marie
CPSO#:
60646
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
14 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Aug 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Hawkesbury General Hospital
1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury, ON K6A 3G5
Date Received: 14 Jun 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:03 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Jun 2019 |