THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:20:25 AM
Patel, Mohan C
CPSO#:
60583
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Mar 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jun 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi
Education: Mysore University, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350 Ext. 2307
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M.C. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Groves Memorial Community Hospital |
Fergus |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Listowel Memorial Hospital |
Listowel |
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp |
Palmerston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:23 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAN C PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 1989 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2021 |