THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:30:50 PM
Shapiro, Lori Elaine
CPSO#:
60568
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Apr 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
400 Bradwick Drive
Suite 200
Concord ON L4K 5V9
Phone: 905-695-2020
Fax: 905-695-3800
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LORI ELAINE SHAPIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPIRO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 09 Mar 1989 to 05 Apr 1989
EL - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 1989 to 20 Sep 1989
EL - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 29 Aug 1991 to 25 Sep 1991
EL - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Apr 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Sep 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 1996 |