THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:28:08 AM
Zaltzman, Jeffrey Steven
CPSO#:
60482
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Dec 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Dec 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Suite 9-118
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7444
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:06 Sep 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFFREY STEVEN ZALTZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZALTZMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Dec 1988 |