THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:54:46 AM
Klassen, Gerhard
CPSO#:
60475
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Oct 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
241 Eighth St
Cochrane ON P0L 1C0
Phone: 7052727200
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Gerhard Klassen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2009
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bahamas
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lady Minto Hospital |
Cochrane |
Sensenbrenner Hospital |
Kapuskasing |
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority |
Moose Factory |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:23 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GERHARD KLASSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLASSEN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 1988 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 2009 |