THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:04:01 AM
Liszauer, Allan Dennis
CPSO#:
60437
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
21 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Nov 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Allan Liszauer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 30 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical records storage facility: Records Management Ltd.
Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093, www.recordsregistry.ca, or Unit 13 - 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 17 Dec 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:13 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Jul 2021 |