THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:20:17 AM
ElKhashab, Magdy Abd El Monaem Hassan Ahmed
CPSO#:
60419
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Nov 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Aug 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
El-Khashab, Magdy Abd El Monaem Hassan Ahmed (used until: 17 May 2007 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1664 Dufferin Street
2nd Floor
Toronto ON M6H 3M1
Phone: (416) 652-0606
Fax: (416) 652-0633
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAGDY ABD EL MONAEM HASSAN AHMED ELKHASHAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELKHASHAB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1993 |