THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 2:39:56 AM
Ley, David Alan
CPSO#:
60401
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
04 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Oct 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
4-Aug-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Bristol Medical School, University of Br, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: David Ley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 8 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:23 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 1988 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 04 Aug 2019 |