THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:55:14 AM
Fahy, James Francis Anthony
CPSO#:
60398
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Oct 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gaelic
Education: National University of Ireland, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: James F. Fahy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 4 2016
Corporation Name: James F. Fahy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Management Ltd.
13 - 1 High Meadow Pl
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 12 Mar 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: November 24, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On November 24, 2017, Georgian Bay General Hospital notified the College that Dr. James Fahy will resign his privileges at Georgian Bay General Hospital effective January 31, 2018, at which time an ongoing investigation by Georgian Bay General Hospital into Dr. Fahy’s care provided to an ICU patient will be closed. In the interim until his resignation, Dr. Fahy has voluntarily agreed not to exercise his privileges relating to the on-call schedule and will continue with out-patient procedures.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:23 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 1988 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Sep 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: October 30, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. James Francis Anthony Fahy to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 30, 2019:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Fahy, in his critical care medicine practice, and also in his conduct, has engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Fahy must not practise critical care medicine in any facility. Dr. Fahy’s clinical practice in Ontario is restricted to the Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care, and he shall not apply for hospital privileges at any other facility.