THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 21:59:54 PM
Mis, Andrew Alexander
CPSO#:
60391
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 May 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 May 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Polish
Education: University of Manitoba, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Manitoba Clinic
790 Sherbrook Street, 7th Floor
Winnipeg MB R3A 1M3
Phone: (204) 788-5729
Fax: (204) 784-4128
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:22 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW ALEXANDER MIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Nov 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 May 1992 |