THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:39:45 AM
O'Kelly, Kevin Francis
CPSO#:
60388
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 78212
Fax: (613) 737-8957
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Almonte General Hospital |
Almonte |
Arnprior Regional Health |
Arnprior |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:10 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEVIN FRANCIS O'KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'KELLY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Oct 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2006 |