THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:12:02 AM
Badcock, Beverley Suzanne
CPSO#:
60359
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Nov 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Nov 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111 Ext. 4228
Fax: (705) 328-6121
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:14 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BEVERLEY SUZANNE BADCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADCOCK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1988 to 11 Nov 1988
EL - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Nov 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 1998 |