THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 13:43:38 PM
Martin, Stuart
CPSO#:
60297
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Mar 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Sep 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Stuart Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 9 2023
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Docudavit Solutions
28 Eugene St
North York, ON M6B 3Z4
Tel: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 11 Feb 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:24 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2023 |