THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:37:23 AM
Zaher, Amjad Nizameddin
CPSO#:
60278
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Dec 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Dec 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Damascus Faculty of Medici, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite A
1909 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON N8W 1C9
Phone: (519) 258-7671
Fax: (519) 258-9281
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:23 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMJAD NIZAMEDDIN ZAHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAHER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 1995 |