THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:51:45 PM
Novick, Richard Joel
CPSO#:
60273
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Sep 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Italian
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Richard J. Novick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:L H S C
Health Records
339 Windermere Road
London, ON N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 35842
Date Received: 07 Aug 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:18 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:24 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Aug 2014 |