THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:49:24 AM
Hafiz, Shujauddin Fazalurrahman
CPSO#:
60269
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Mar 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Mar 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: Karnatak University Dharwar, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2227 South Millway
Suite 301
Mississauga ON L5L 3R6
Phone: (905) 569-9798
Fax: (905) 569-8630
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. S. Hafiz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:03 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHUJAUDDIN FAZALURRAHMAN HAFIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAFIZ is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 1995 |