THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:07:39 AM
Goodman, Robert Leslie
CPSO#:
60228
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Dec 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus Room B6-118
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:17 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT LESLIE GOODMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 15 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 1991 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Nov 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 1995 |