THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 0:55:04 AM
Chadha, Uday
CPSO#:
60215
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Rajasthan University, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1883 Bank Street
Ottawa ON K1V 7Z9
Phone: (613) 526-3377
Fax: (613) 260-1887
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:05 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. UDAY CHADHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHADHA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1989 |