THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:24:32 AM
Harricharan, Rajendra
CPSO#:
60214
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
07 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Dec 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
7-Apr-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Utkal University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Rajendra Harricharan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:19 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1993 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 07 Apr 2019 |