THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 17:48:51 PM
Hussain, Shabnam
CPSO#:
60204
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Apr 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Apr 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
1929 Russell Road
Smyth Medical Centre
Ottawa ON K1G 4G3
Phone: (613) 249-0803
Fax: (613) 249-0804
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:28 Jun 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHABNAM HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 1990 |