THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 2:57:01 AM
Kormendi, Ferenc
CPSO#:
60203
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hungarian
Education: Medical University of Debrecen, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Frank Kormendi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 27 2018
Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave, East York, ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Date Received: 08 Jun 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:25 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Oct 1995
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Jun 2018 |