THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 2:47:10 AM
Rajasingham, Menaka
CPSO#:
60190
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Dec 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Sri Lanka, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:19 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2023 |