THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 17:15:26 PM
Okun, Nanette Bell
CPSO#:
60158
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Apr 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Apr 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
L122-2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Hospital
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164805379
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NANETTE BELL OKUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKUN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Oct 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 2001 |