THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:28:27 AM
Dzavik, Vladimir
CPSO#:
60151
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Oct 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Oct 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English, Slovak
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiology
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
6 E N - 246A
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 6265
Fax: (416) 340-3390
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:27 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VLADIMIR DZAVIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DZAVIK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Oct 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 2000 |