THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 17:49:19 PM
Rodway-Norman, Mark Tourneur
CPSO#:
60145
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Aug 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Nov 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Brain Health Centre
17 Colborne Street E
Suite 104
Orillia ON L3V 1T4
Phone: 705-327-7070
Fax: (705) 327-7474
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: July 10, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On July 10, 2019, Soldiers’ Memorial Hospital, Orillia, notified the College, pursuant to s.85.5 (2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that on June 23, 2019 Dr. Mark Tourneur Rodway-Norman voluntarily restricted practice to seeing out-patients only in Dr. Rodway-Norman’s hospital office setting pending the completion of an investigation by the hospital, and that on July 9, 2019 Dr. Rodway-Norman took a leave of absence pending the completion of the investigation.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:19 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK TOURNEUR RODWAY-NORMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODWAY-NORMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 1990 |