THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 9:24:37 AM
Lee, Peter Kwok On
CPSO#:
60138
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
99 Kakulu Road
Suite 212
Kanata ON K2L 3C8
Phone: (613) 599-4452
Fax: (613) 599-6413
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:04 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology |
Effective:21 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER KWOK ON LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1988 |