THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 17:25:08 PM
Carlisle, Euan James Frazer
CPSO#:
60125
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Dec 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
30 Bond St S
Hamilton ON L8S 1S7
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Euan Carlisle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 25 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:07 Sep 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Dec 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 May 2023 |