THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:17:17 AM
Lesiuk, Lawrence Stephen
CPSO#:
60111
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Corporation
Hamilton General Division
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:04 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAWRENCE STEPHEN LESIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESIUK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1990 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1991 |