THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:10:43 PM
Baghdadlian, Hovsep
CPSO#:
60032
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Armenian, English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 406
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 913-7224
Fax: (416) 913-6286
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:08 Sep 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:30 May 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HOVSEP BAGHDADLIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGHDADLIAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1988 |